# Whole Numbers

In this article, we are learning about **Whole Numbers** as per the Primary 5 Math level.

The learning objectives are:

- Reading and Writing Numbers
- Multiplying or Dividing by 10, 100 or 1000 and their multiples

**1. Reading And Writing Numbers**

Whole numbers include zero and counting numbers. They are without fractions. In Primary 5, we will learn Numbers up to 10 million.

Let’s place the digits in 675 840 in their respective place values.

We read 675 840 as six hundred and seventy-five thousand, eight hundred and forty.

The place value of the digit 6 is hundred thousands. The value of the digit 6 is 600 000.

The place value of the digit 7 is ten thousands. The value of the digit 7 is 70 000.

The place value of the digit 5 is thousands. The value of the digit 5 is 5000.

The place value of the digit 8 is hundreds. The value of the digit 8 is 800.

The place value of the digit 4 is tens. The value of the digit 4 is 40.

Remember the ‘s’ for the place values!

Let us try placing the digits in 9 675 840 in their respective place values.

We read 9 675 840 as nine million, six hundred and seventy-five thousand, eight hundred and forty.

The place value of the digit **9** is **millions**. The value of the digit 9 is 9 000 000.

It is a good habit to include spaces at the appropriate places when writing numbers in numerals.

Remember to include a comma and hyphen(s) at the appropriate places when writing numbers in words.

**Question 1:**

Write the following in numerals.

**Solution:**

Place the digits in a place value chart as shown below.

Three million, three hundred thousand, four hundred and thirty-five = 3 300 435

**Answer:**

3 300 435

**Question 2:**

Write the following number in numerals.

**Solution:**

Place the digits in a place value chart as shown below.

**Answer:**

8 450 207

**Question 3:**

Write the following in numerals.

**Solution:**

Place the digits in a place value chart as shown below.

**Answer:**

4 015 068

**Question 4:**

Write the following in words.

**Solution:**

Place the digits in a place value chart as shown below.

3 051 043 = Three million**,** fifty**-**one thousand and forty**-**three

**Answer:**

Three million**,** fifty-one thousand and forty**-**three

**Question 5:**

Write in words the following number.

**Solution:**

Place the digits in a place value chart as shown below.

7 250 025 = Seven million, two hundred and fifty thousand and twenty-five

**Answer:**

Seven million, two hundred and fifty thousand and twenty-five

**Question 6:**

Write the following in words.

**Solution:**

Place the digits in a place value chart as shown below.

4 325 630 = Four million, three hundred and twenty-five thousand, six hundred and thirty

**Answer:**

Four million, three hundred and twenty-five thousand, six hundred and thirty

**2. Multiplying or Dividing by 10, 100 or 1000 and their multiples**

**Multiplying by 10, 100 or 1000 **

When we multiply a whole number by 10, we add one ‘0’ after the number.

*Example:*

5 × **1****0** = 5**0**

When we multiply a whole number by 100, we add two ‘0’s after the number.

*Example:*

5 × **100 ****=**** **5**00**

When we multiply a whole number by 1000, we add three ‘0’s after the number.

*Example:*

5 × **1000 ****=**** **5**000**

**Question 1:**

Match.

**Solution:**

**Multiplying by the multiples of 10, 100 or 1000 **

Now let’s multiply a number by the multiples of 10, 100 or 1000.

When we multiply a whole number by a multiple of 10, we express the multiple of 10 as a product of a number and 10.

*Example:*

12 × **50** = 12 × **5 **×** 10**

= 60 × 10

= 600

When we multiply a whole number by a multiple of 100, we express the multiple of 100 as a product of a number and 100.

*Example*:

12 **500** = 12 × **5 **×** 100**

= 60 × 100

= 6000

When we multiply a whole number by a multiple of 1000, we express the multiple of 1000 as a product of a number and 1000.

*Example*:

12 **5000 **= 12 × **5 **×** 1000**

= 60 × 1000

= 60 000

**Question 1:**

Do the following multiplication.

- 27 × 1000 = __________
- 27 × 5000 = __________

**Solution:**

- 27 × 1000 = 27 000

- 27 × 5000 = 27 × 5 × 1000

= 135 × 1000

= 135 000

**Answer:**

- 27 000
- 135 000

**Question 2:**

Do the following multiplication.

319 × 6000 = _________

**Solution:**

319 6000 = 319 × 6 × 1000

= 1 914 000

**Answer:**

1 914 000

**Question 3:**

Do the following multiplication.

700 × 9000 = _________

**Solution:**

7 × 100 × 9 × 1000 = 7 × 9 × 100 × 1000

= 6 300 000

**Answer:**

6 300 000

**Question 4:**

Fill in the blanks.

- 12 × __________ = 12 000
- 12 × __________ = 120 000

**Solution:**

- 12 ×
__1000__= 12 000 - 12 ×
__10 000__= 120 000

**Answer:**

- 1000
- 10 000

**Question 5:**

Fill in the blanks

60 × __________ = 720

**Solution:**

60 × ________ = 720

60 × __ ____12 __ = 720

**Answer:**

12

**Dividing by 10, 100 or 1000 **

When we divide a whole number by 10, we remove one ‘0’ after the number.

*Example*:

70 00**0** ÷ 1**0** = 7000

When we divide a whole number by 100, we remove two ‘0’s after the number.

*Example*:

70 0**00 **÷ 1**00** = 700

When we divide a whole number by 1000, we remove three ‘0’s after the number.

*Example*:

70 **000 **÷ 1**000** = 70

**Question 1:**

Do the following division.

880 ÷ 10 = __________

**Solution:**

880 ÷ 10 = 88

**Answer:**

88

**Question 2:**

Do the following division.

293 000 ÷ 100 = __________

**Solution:**

293 000 ÷ 100 = 2930

**Answer:**

2930

**Question 3:**

Do the following division.

630 000 ÷ 1000 =__________

**Solution:**

630 000 ÷ 1000 = 630

**Answer:**

630

**Dividing by the multiples of 10, 100 or 1000 **

Now let’s divide a number by the multiples of 10, 100 or 1000.

When we divide a whole number by a multiple of 10, we break the multiple of 10 into 10 and a number. We will divide by 10 first, followed by the number.

*Example:*

30 000 ÷ **60** = 30 000 ÷ **10 **÷** 6**

= 3000 ÷ 6

= 500

When we divide a whole number by a multiple of 100, we break the multiple of 100 into 100 and a number. We will divide by 100 first, followed by the number.

*Example:*

30 000 ÷ **600 **= 30 000 ÷ **100 **÷** 6**

= 300 ÷ 6

= 50

When we divide a whole number by a multiple of 1000, we break the multiple of 1000 into 1000 and a number. We will divide by 1000 first, followed by the number.

*Example:*

30 000 **6000** = 30 000 ÷** 1000 **÷** 6**

= 30 ÷ 6

= 5

**Question 1:**

Do the following division.

36 600 ÷ 60 =__________

**Solution:**

36 600 ÷ 60 = 36 600 ÷ 10 ÷ 6

= 3660 ÷ 6

= 610

**Answer:**

610

**Question 2:**

Do the following division.

44 800 ÷ 800 =__________

**Solution:**

44 800 ÷ 800 = 44 800 ÷ 100 ÷ 8

= 448 ÷ 8

= 56

**Answer:**

56

**Question 3:**

Do the following division.

630 000 ÷ 9000 =__________

**Solution:**

630 000 ÷ 9000 = 630 000 ÷ 1000 ÷ 9

= 630 ÷ 9

= 70

**Answer:**

70

**Question 4:**

Fill in the blanks with the correct answer.

8400 ÷ __________= 70

**Solution:**

8400 ÷ 70 = 8400 ÷ 10 ÷ 7

= 840 ÷ 7

= 120

**Answer:**

120

**Conclusion**

In this article, we learnt about the **Whole Numbers **as per the Primary 5 Math level. We learnt the following subtopics in Whole Numbers:

- Reading and Writing Numbers up to 10 million
- Multiplication and Division by 10, 100, or 1000 and their multiples.